Tuesday, November 18, 2008
Mr. Rajiv Mathur to succeed Mr. P. C. Haldar?
After many years, an IPS officer of Uttar Pradesh cadre is expected to become the Chief Indian Intelligence Bureau (IB). It is being speculated that the outgoing Chief of IB, Mr. P. C. Haldar, IPS (BH, 1970), is likely to be succeeded by Mr. Rajiv Mathur, IPS (UP, 1972), on completion of his tenure in the month of December, 2008. At present, Mr. Mathur is serving as Special Director in the IB.
Mr. Rajiv Mehrishi may join GOI
Mr. Rajiv Mehrishi, IAS (RJ, 1978), Principal Resident Commissioner, Rajasthan House is tipped to be in consideration for his next assignment in the Central government on deputation. Mr. Mehrishi has recently been empanelled as Additional Secretary in the Government of India.
Mr. V. P. Aggarwal may become next Chairman, AAI
Mr. V. P. Aggarwal, Member (Planning), Airports Authority of India may succeed Dr. K. Ramalingam as the next Chairman of Airports Authority of India, sources informed.
Mr. Rajiv Gauba appointed J. S., Environment & Forest
Mr. Rajiv Gauba, IAS (JH, 1982) has been appointed as the next Joint Secretary in the Ministry of Environment and Forest, Government of India in place of Mr. R. K. Vaish, IAS (MT, 1978), who will complete his tenure on 15th January, 2009.
Mr. A. K. Pujari appointed Secretary, Economic Advisory Council to the PM
Mr. Anup K. Pujari, IAS (KN, 1980), Joint Secretary in the Department of Economic Affairs, Ministry of Finance has been appointed as next Secretary, Economic Advisory Council to the Prime Minister. The Earlier incumbent to the post, Dr. Alok Sheel, IAS (KL, 1982) was shifted as Joint Secretary to the Department of Economic Affairs, Ministry of Finance.
Mr. S. K. Ray to be elevated
Mr. S. K. Ray, CSS, Joint Secretary and Financial Advisor in the Department of Higher Education, Ministry of Human Resources Development is being appointed as Additional Secretary and Financial Advisor in the Department of Higher Education, Ministry of Human Resources Development.
Mr. V. K. Agarwal to get extension
Mr. V. K. Agarwal is being given extension as Managing Director, Rail India Technical and Economic Services (RITES) for a period from 01st May, 2009 to 31st October, 2010.
Mr. Mahendra Jain to be Development Commissioner, SEZ
Mr. Mahendra Jain, IAS (KN, 1985) has been appointed as Development Commissioner, Special Economic Zone at Navi Mumbai, Department of Commerce. The post which is equivalent to the rank of Joint Secretary was created in the month of August, 2008.
Mr. B. R. Mandal to get extension
Mr. B. R. Mandal, IA&AS (1975) is being given extension as Chief Vigilance Officer (CVO) in the Hindustan Petroleum Corporation Limited (HPCL), Mumbai under the Ministry of Petroleum and Natural Gas for a period from 09th November, 2008 to 31st May, 2009.
Ms. Ambika Khatua to get extension
Ms. Ambika Khatua, IRS (IT, 1979) is being given two years extension as Chief Vigilance Officer (CVO) in the Bharat Heavy Electricals Limited (BHEL), New Delhi for a period from 06th October, 2008 to 06th October, 2010.
Mr. Verghese Samuel going back to his cadre
Mr. Verghese Samuel, IAS (JK, 1976), Joint Secretary in the Department of Ayurveda, Yoga & Naturopathy, Unani, Siddha and Homoeopathy (AYUSH), Ministry of Health and Family Welfare is going back to his parent cadre of Jammu and Kashmir.
Mr. A. K. Tiwari to be empanelled for the post of Additional Member (Planning), Railway Board
Mr. A. K. Tiwari, IRSME is being empanelled for appointment as Additional Member (Planning), Railway Board.
0 comments:
Post a Comment